IA HF210 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 623.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 623.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the use of a straight wall cartridge rifle to hunt deer and including penalties. (See HF 475.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the use of a straight wall cartridge rifle to hunt deer and including penalties. (See HF 475.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 623. |
2017-02-22 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 454. |
2017-02-07 | House | Subcommittee: Baxter, Hanson and Wills. H.J. 245. |
2017-02-06 | House | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 192. |
Same As/Similar To
HF475 (Similar To) 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1009.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF210 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF210.html |