IA HF457 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-05 - Withdrawn. H.J. 508.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-05 - Withdrawn. H.J. 508.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act exempting the sales price of honey bees from the state sales and use tax.(See HF 676, HF 2627.)
Title
A bill for an act exempting the sales price of honey bees from the state sales and use tax.(See HF 676, HF 2627.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 508. |
2023-03-21 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 676. |
2023-03-21 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 708. |
2023-03-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2023-03-15 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/16/2023 8:15AM House Lounge. |
2023-03-08 | House | Subcommittee: Jones, Isenhart and Sexton. H.J. 561. |
2023-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 430. |
Same As/Similar To
HF676 (Similar To) 2024-03-05 - Withdrawn. H.J. 508.
HF2627 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Subcommittee: Driscoll, Koelker, and Quirmbach. S.J. 509.
HF2627 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Subcommittee: Driscoll, Koelker, and Quirmbach. S.J. 509.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF457 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF457.html |