IA HF382 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 884.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 884.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act authorizing the department of transportation to issue special permits allowing the transportation of loads of relief supplies that exceed statutory weight limits during periods of national emergency. (Formerly HSB 100.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Title
A bill for an act authorizing the department of transportation to issue special permits allowing the transportation of loads of relief supplies that exceed statutory weight limits during periods of national emergency. (Formerly HSB 100.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-02 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 884. |
2021-04-02 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 884. |
2021-03-30 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 868. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 700. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 45, nays 0. S.J. 696. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Substituted for SF 422. S.J. 696. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Attached to companion SF 422. S.J. 476. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Read first time, passed on file. S.J. 365. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 365. |
2021-02-16 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 437. |
2021-02-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 545. |
2021-02-17 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 466. |
2021-02-16 | House | Passed House, yeas 92, nays none. H.J. 417. |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 296. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB100 (Related) 2021-02-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 382.
SSB1138 (Related) 2021-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 422.
SF422 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. S.J. 697.
SSB1138 (Related) 2021-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 422.
SF422 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. S.J. 697.