IA HF313 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-22 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-22 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to moneys received from citations issued using an automated or remote system for traffic law enforcement.
Title
A bill for an act relating to moneys received from citations issued using an automated or remote system for traffic law enforcement.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Gustoff [R] | Rep. Devon Wood [R] | Rep. Dan Gehlbach [R] | Rep. Tom Determann [R] |
Rep. Norlin Mommsen [R] | Rep. Jeff Shipley [R] | Rep. Dean Fisher [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. |
2023-02-21 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/22/2023 8:00AM RM 19. |
2023-02-20 | House | Subcommittee: Gustoff, Scheetz and Shipley. H.J. 382. |
2023-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 352. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF313 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF313.html |