IA HF30 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - Subcommittee reassigned: Upmeyer, Dolecheck and Hunter. H.J. 121.
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - Subcommittee reassigned: Upmeyer, Dolecheck and Hunter. H.J. 121.
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the treatment of adoptive parent employees and making penalties applicable.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the treatment of adoptive parent employees and making penalties applicable.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Upmeyer, Dolecheck and Hunter. H.J. 121. |
2019-01-22 | House | Subcommittee: Grassley, Dolecheck and Hunter. H.J. 130. |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced, referred to Labor. H.J. 90. |
Same As/Similar To
SF234 (Similar To) 2019-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF30 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF30.html |