IA HF283 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-07 - Withdrawn. H.J. 554.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-07 - Withdrawn. H.J. 554.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to private instruction, including modifying provisions related to independent private instruction and the reports and evidence of immunizations required under competent private instruction.(See HF 464, HF 2280.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to private instruction, including modifying provisions related to independent private instruction and the reports and evidence of immunizations required under competent private instruction.(See HF 464, HF 2280.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 554. |
2023-02-27 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 464. |
2023-02-23 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 419. |
2023-02-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. |
2023-02-21 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Gustoff, Cahill and Osmundson. H.J. 381. |
2023-02-20 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2023 11:00AM House Lounge. |
2023-02-15 | House | Subcommittee: Gustoff, Boden and Cahill. H.J. 358. |
2023-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 305. |
Same As/Similar To
HF464 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Withdrawn. H.J. 554.
HF2280 (Similar To) 2024-03-13 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
HF2280 (Similar To) 2024-03-13 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF283 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF283.html |