IA HF464 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-07 - Withdrawn. H.J. 554.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-07 - Withdrawn. H.J. 554.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to private instruction, including modifying provisions related to independent private instruction and the reports and evidence of immunizations required under competent private instruction.(Formerly HF 283; See HF 2280.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to private instruction, including modifying provisions related to independent private instruction and the reports and evidence of immunizations required under competent private instruction.(Formerly HF 283; See HF 2280.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 554. |
2024-02-01 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2280. |
2024-01-30 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 173. |
2024-01-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0. |
2024-01-10 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/11/2024 12:15PM RM 19. |
2024-01-10 | House | Subcommittee: Gustoff, Cahill and Fry. H.J. 70. |
2023-05-04 | House | Rereferred to Education. H.J. 1029. |
2023-03-14 | House | Amendments H-1091 and H-1092 filed. H.J. 622. |
2023-02-27 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 431. |
Same As/Similar To
HF283 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Withdrawn. H.J. 554.
HF2280 (Similar To) 2024-03-13 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
HF2280 (Similar To) 2024-03-13 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF464 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF464.html |