IA HF283 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 645.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act creating the criminal offense of defrauding a drug or alcohol test and providing penalties. (Formerly HSB 22.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act creating the criminal offense of defrauding a drug or alcohol test and providing penalties. (Formerly HSB 22.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 61 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-08HouseSigned by Governor. H.J. 645.
2021-03-08HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 645.
2021-06-08HouseFiscal note.
2021-02-17HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 443.
2021-02-17SenateImmediate message. S.J. 383.
2021-02-17SenatePassed Senate, yeas 32, nays 16. S.J. 381.
2021-02-17SenateSubstituted for SF 329. S.J. 380.
2021-02-17SenateRead first time, attached to companion SF 329. S.J. 364.
2021-02-17SenateMessage from House. S.J. 364.
2021-02-16HouseImmediate message. H.J. 437.
2021-02-24HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 545.
2021-02-17HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 466.
2021-02-16HousePassed House, yeas 61, nays 30. H.J. 436.
2021-02-24HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 545.
2021-02-16HouseAmendment H-1055 adopted. H.J. 436.
2021-02-11HouseAmendment H-1055 filed. H.J. 387.
2021-02-03HouseFiscal note.
2021-01-28HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 233.

Same As/Similar To

HSB22 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 283.
SSB1047 (Related) 2021-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 329.
SF329 (Similar To) 2021-02-17 - Withdrawn. S.J. 381.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback