IA SSB1047 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF283
Note: Legislation replaced by SF329
Note: Legislation replaced by SF329
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act creating the criminal offense of defrauding a drug or alcohol test and providing penalties.(See SF 329.)
Title
A bill for an act creating the criminal offense of defrauding a drug or alcohol test and providing penalties.(See SF 329.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 329. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/03/2021 8:30AM RM 24A. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Subcommittee: Brown, Klimesh, and Mathis. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Commerce. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
HSB22 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 283.
HF283 (Replaced by) 2021-03-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 645.
SF329 (Replaced by) 2021-12-31 - END OF [] ACTIONS
HF283 (Replaced by) 2021-03-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 645.
SF329 (Replaced by) 2021-12-31 - END OF [] ACTIONS
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1047 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1047.html |