IA SF329 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-31 - END OF [] ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-31 - END OF [] ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act creating the criminal offense of defrauding a drug or alcohol test and providing penalties.(Formerly SSB 1047.)
Title
A bill for an act creating the criminal offense of defrauding a drug or alcohol test and providing penalties.(Formerly SSB 1047.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3030 be adopted? (Y: 16 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3025 be adopted? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce Report (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3025 be adopted? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce Report (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-31 | Senate | END OF [] ACTIONS |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 381. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | HF 283 substituted. S.J. 380. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Amendment S-3025 adopted. S.J. 380. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Amendment S-3030 filed, lost. S.J. 379. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Attached to similar HF 283. S.J. 364. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Amendment S-3025 filed. S.J. 362. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 333. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 326. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB22 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 283.
SSB1047 (Related) 2021-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 329.
HF283 (Similar To) 2021-03-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 645.
SSB1047 (Related) 2021-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 329.
HF283 (Similar To) 2021-03-08 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 645.