IA HF2693 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 940.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 940.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the justice system, and including effective date provisions. Effective date: 05/09/2024, 07/01/2024.
Title
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the justice system, and including effective date provisions. Effective date: 05/09/2024, 07/01/2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-19 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 59 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5227 be adopted? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5226 be adopted? (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5225 be adopted? (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5224 be adopted? (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-04-19 - House - Shall amendment H–8376, to amendment H–8367, be adopted? (Y: 35 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5227 be adopted? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5226 be adopted? (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5225 be adopted? (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5224 be adopted? (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-04-19 - House - Shall amendment H–8376, to amendment H–8367, be adopted? (Y: 35 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 940. |
2024-04-30 | House | NOBA: Final |
2024-04-29 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 935. |
2024-04-19 | House | NOBA: House Floor |
2024-04-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 893. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 922. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 0. S.J. 921. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-5227 filed, lost. S.J. 921. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-5226 filed, lost. S.J. 920. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-5225 filed, lost. S.J. 919. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-5224 filed, lost. S.J. 919. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2434. S.J. 918. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Read first time, attached to SF 2434. S.J. 910. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 910. |
2024-04-19 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 891. |
2024-04-19 | House | Passed House, yeas 59, nays 32. H.J. 880. |
2024-04-19 | House | Amendment H-8367 adopted. H.J. 880. |
2024-04-19 | House | Amendment H-8376 to amendment H-8367, yeas 35, nays 56, filed, lost. H.J. 879. |
2024-04-18 | House | Amendment H-8367 filed. H.J. 874. |
2024-04-16 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2024-04-16 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 794. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3200 (Related) 2024-04-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2434.
SF2434 (Similar To) 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 922.
SF2434 (Similar To) 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 922.