IA HF263 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1115.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1115.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the criminal offenses of domestic abuse and unauthorized placement of a global positioning device, and providing penalties. Effective 7-1-17.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the criminal offenses of domestic abuse and unauthorized placement of a global positioning device, and providing penalties. Effective 7-1-17.
Sponsors
Sen. Zach Nunn [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - Passed House (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - Passed House (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - Passed House (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - Passed House (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-20 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1115. |
2017-04-18 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 1075. |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 1075. |
2017-04-10 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 922. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 940. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays 0. S.J. 939. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Substituted for SF 422. S.J. 939. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time and attached to similar SF 422. S.J. 777. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 777. |
2017-03-27 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 786. |
2017-03-28 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 803. |
2017-03-27 | House | Passed House, ayes 90, nays 8. H.J. 775. |
2017-03-27 | House | Amendment H-1215 out of order. H.J. 774. |
2017-03-27 | House | Amendment H-1230 adopted. H.J. 774. |
2017-03-22 | House | Amendment H-1230 filed. H.J. 759. |
2017-03-16 | House | Amendment H-1215 filed. H.J. 681. |
2017-03-15 | House | Fiscal note. |
2017-02-28 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 485. |
2017-02-13 | House | Subcommittee: Nunn, Hein and R. Smith. H.J. 270. |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 252. |
Same As/Similar To
SF308 (Similar To) 2017-03-01 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF422 (Similar To) 2017-04-10 - Withdrawn. S.J. 941.
SF422 (Similar To) 2017-04-10 - Withdrawn. S.J. 941.