IA SF308 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-01 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-01 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the criminal offenses of domestic abuse, harassment, stalking, and unauthorized placement of a global positioning device, and providing penalties. (See SF 422.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the criminal offenses of domestic abuse, harassment, stalking, and unauthorized placement of a global positioning device, and providing penalties. (See SF 422.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schneider, Dawson, and Petersen. S.J. 403. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 368. |
Same As/Similar To
HF263 (Similar To) 2017-04-20 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1115.
SF422 (Similar To) 2017-04-10 - Withdrawn. S.J. 941.
SF422 (Similar To) 2017-04-10 - Withdrawn. S.J. 941.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF308 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF308.html |