IA HF2607 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-08 - Withdrawn. H.J. 745.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-08 - Withdrawn. H.J. 745.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to vehicles, including the initial registration and issuance of certificate of title by any county treasurer and the definitions of terms for purposes of motor vehicle franchisers.(Formerly HSB 610; See HF 2678.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to vehicles, including the initial registration and issuance of certificate of title by any county treasurer and the definitions of terms for purposes of motor vehicle franchisers.(Formerly HSB 610; See HF 2678.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 745. |
2024-04-01 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2678. |
2024-03-28 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 698. |
2024-03-12 | House | Fiscal note. |
2024-03-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. |
2024-03-07 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/11/2024 12:30PM House Lounge 2. |
2024-03-06 | House | Subcommittee: Best, Wilson and Wulf. H.J. 536. |
2024-02-21 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 361. |
2024-02-19 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 295. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB610 (Related) 2024-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2607.
HF2678 (Similar To) 2024-04-15 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
HF2678 (Similar To) 2024-04-15 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].