IA HF2602 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing a criminal offense of grooming and providing penalties. (Formerly HSB 575.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Title
A bill for an act establishing a criminal offense of grooming and providing penalties. (Formerly HSB 575.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Fiscal note. |
2024-05-01 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 938. |
2024-04-24 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 934. |
2024-04-17 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 829. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 864. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 0. S.J. 862. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 611. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 522. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/12/2024 1:30PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Evans, Shipley, and Weiner. S.J. 509. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 506. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 506. |
2024-03-07 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 554. |
2024-03-07 | House | Passed House, yeas 94, nays 0. H.J. 549. |
2024-03-07 | House | Amendment H-8170 adopted. H.J. 549. |
2024-03-06 | House | Amendment H-8170 filed. H.J. 540. |
2024-03-01 | House | Fiscal note. |
2024-02-19 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 294. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB575 (Related) 2024-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2602.