IA HF2600 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 938.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 938.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the venue for prosecution of a controlled substance violation resulting in the death or serious bodily injury of another. (Formerly HF 2227.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the venue for prosecution of a controlled substance violation resulting in the death or serious bodily injury of another. (Formerly HF 2227.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 938. |
2024-04-23 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 934. |
2024-04-03 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 719. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 737. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 735. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 611. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 522. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/07/2024 11:00AM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Subcommittee: Webster, Knox, and J. Taylor. S.J. 454. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 429. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 429. |
2024-02-29 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 481. |
2024-03-05 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 508. |
2024-03-04 | House | Explanations of votes. H.J. 497. |
2024-02-29 | House | Passed House, yeas 93, nays 0. H.J. 474. |
2024-02-29 | House | Amendment H-8092 adopted. H.J. 474. |
2024-02-28 | House | Amendment H-8092 filed. H.J. 453. |
2024-02-19 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 294. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2227 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 481.