IA HF2227 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 481.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 481.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the venue for prosecution of a controlled substance violation resulting in the death or serious bodily injury of another.(See HF 2600.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the venue for prosecution of a controlled substance violation resulting in the death or serious bodily injury of another.(See HF 2600.)
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Dunwell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 481. |
2024-02-19 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2600. |
2024-02-15 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 282. |
2024-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-02-05 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2024 12:45PM House Lounge 2. |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee: Dunwell, Lohse and Olson. H.J. 171. |
2024-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 165. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2600 (Similar To) 2024-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 938.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF2227 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF2227.html |