IA HF2593 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the review of an officer-involved shooting case by a county attorney. (Formerly HF 2231.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the review of an officer-involved shooting case by a county attorney. (Formerly HF 2231.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/12/2024 4:00PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Subcommittee: Rowley, Boulton, and J. Taylor. S.J. 454. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 429. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 429. |
2024-02-29 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 481. |
2024-03-05 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 508. |
2024-03-04 | House | Explanations of votes. H.J. 497. |
2024-02-29 | House | Passed House, yeas 92, nays 0. H.J. 480. |
2024-02-29 | House | Amendment H-8101 adopted. H.J. 480. |
2024-02-28 | House | Amendment H-8101 filed. H.J. 453. |
2024-02-19 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 293. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2231 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 481.