IA HF257 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act exempting from the individual income tax all pay received from the federal government for certain military service in support of the national guard and including retroactive applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act exempting from the individual income tax all pay received from the federal government for certain military service in support of the national guard and including retroactive applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-03-30 | House | Fiscal note. |
2021-03-29 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/30/2021 1:00PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2021-03-15 | House | Subcommittee: Nordman, Boden and Jacoby. H.J. 730. |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 229. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1248 (Related) 2021-04-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 603.
SF603 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Goodwin, and T. Taylor. S.J. 120.
SF603 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Goodwin, and T. Taylor. S.J. 120.