IA SSB1248 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF257
Note: Legislation replaced by SF603
Note: Legislation replaced by SF603
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 603.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 603.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act exempting from the individual income tax all pay received from the federal government for certain military service in support of the national guard and including retroactive applicability provisions.(See SF 603.)
Title
A bill for an act exempting from the individual income tax all pay received from the federal government for certain military service in support of the national guard and including retroactive applicability provisions.(See SF 603.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 603. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/16/2021 2:00PM RM 24A. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Subcommittee: Carlin, Dotzler, and Green. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Same As/Similar To
HF257 (Replaced by) 2021-04-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
SF603 (Replaced by) 2022-01-19 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Goodwin, and T. Taylor. S.J. 120.
SF603 (Replaced by) 2022-01-19 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Goodwin, and T. Taylor. S.J. 120.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1248 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1248.html |