IA HF2555 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Subcommittee: Williams, Johnson, and Quirmbach. S.J. 667.
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Subcommittee: Williams, Johnson, and Quirmbach. S.J. 667.
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing the cybersecurity simulation training center at the Iowa state university of science and technology.(Formerly HF 2361, HSB 669.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing the cybersecurity simulation training center at the Iowa state university of science and technology.(Formerly HF 2361, HSB 669.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Senate | Subcommittee: Williams, Johnson, and Quirmbach. S.J. 667. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Commerce. S.J. 595. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 595. |
2022-03-22 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 624. |
2022-03-22 | House | Passed House, yeas 92, nays 2. H.J. 613. |
2022-03-17 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 591. |
2022-03-14 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 546. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB669 (Related) 2022-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2361.
HF2361 (Similar To) 2022-03-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 624.
HF2361 (Similar To) 2022-03-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 624.