IA HF2549 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-13 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 945.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-13 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 945.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the establishment of a mental health professional loan repayment program within the college student aid commission. (Formerly HF 2137, HSB 537.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the establishment of a mental health professional loan repayment program within the college student aid commission. (Formerly HF 2137, HSB 537.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - House - Shall the House concur in the Senate amendment H–8366? (Y: 52 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5140 be adopted? (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - House - Shall the House concur in the Senate amendment H–8366? (Y: 52 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5140 be adopted? (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-13 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 945. |
2022-06-02 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 942. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 894. |
2022-05-23 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 887. |
2022-06-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 942. |
2022-05-23 | House | Passed House, yeas 83, nays 0. H.J. 881. |
2022-05-23 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8366, yeas 52, nays 31. H.J. 880. |
2022-04-26 | House | Senate amendment H-8366 filed. H.J. 865. |
2022-04-26 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 857. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 811. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 44, nays 0. S.J. 807. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Amendment S-5140 filed, adopted. S.J. 807. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2195. S.J. 806. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 553. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Read first time, attached to similar SF 2195. S.J. 542. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 542. |
2022-03-15 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 581. |
2022-03-22 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 625. |
2022-03-17 | House | NOBA: House Floor |
2022-03-15 | House | Passed House, yeas 94, nays 2. H.J. 577. |
2022-03-15 | House | Amendment H-8181 adopted. H.J. 577. |
2022-03-14 | House | Amendment H-8181 filed. H.J. 568. |
2022-03-07 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 489. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB537 (Related) 2022-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2137.
HF2137 (Similar To) 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn. H.J. 581.
HF2137 (Similar To) 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn. H.J. 581.