IA HSB537 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2137
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2549
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2549
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2137.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2137.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the establishment of a prescribing mental health practitioner loan repayment program, and providing an appropriation.(See HF 2137, HF 2549.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the establishment of a prescribing mental health practitioner loan repayment program, and providing an appropriation.(See HF 2137, HF 2549.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-28 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2137. |
2022-01-25 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 134. |
2022-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-01-18 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/19/2022 12:00PM RM 19. |
2022-01-13 | House | Subcommittee: Dolecheck, Forbes and Moore, T. H.J. 82. |
2022-01-13 | House | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 81. |
2022-01-13 | House | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
HF2137 (Replaced by) 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn. H.J. 581.
HF2549 (Replaced by) 2022-06-13 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 945.
HF2549 (Replaced by) 2022-06-13 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 945.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB537 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB537.html |