IA HF2524 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-28 - Amendment H-8103 filed. H.J. 454.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-28 - Amendment H-8103 filed. H.J. 454.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to claims for unemployment insurance benefits and including effective date provisions.(Formerly HSB 655.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to claims for unemployment insurance benefits and including effective date provisions.(Formerly HSB 655.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | House | Amendment H-8103 filed. H.J. 454. |
2024-02-28 | House | Amendment H-8086 filed. H.J. 453. |
2024-02-14 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 267. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3093 (Related) 2024-01-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2106.
SF2106 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Amendment H-8121 filed. H.J. 498.
HSB655 (Related) 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2524.
SF2106 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Amendment H-8121 filed. H.J. 498.
HSB655 (Related) 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2524.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF2524 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF2524.html |