IA HF2472 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 622.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 622.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to tampering with witnesses or jurors, and providing penalties. (Formerly HF 2226.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to tampering with witnesses or jurors, and providing penalties. (Formerly HF 2226.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 78 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 78 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 622. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 555. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/16/2022 10:00AM Room G15. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Subcommittee: Reichman, Boulton, and Shipley. S.J. 471. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 439. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 439. |
2022-03-02 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 467. |
2022-03-02 | House | Passed House, yeas 78, nays 21. H.J. 465. |
2022-03-02 | House | Amendment H-8114 adopted. H.J. 465. |
2022-03-01 | House | Amendment H-8114 filed. H.J. 441. |
2022-02-23 | House | Fiscal note. |
2022-02-18 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 299. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2226 (Similar To) 2022-03-02 - Withdrawn. H.J. 489.