IA HF2465 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Amendment H-8217 filed. H.J. 518.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Amendment H-8217 filed. H.J. 518.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act creating a law enforcement body camera interim workgroup. (Formerly HSB 601.)
Title
A bill for an act creating a law enforcement body camera interim workgroup. (Formerly HSB 601.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | House | Amendment H-8217 filed. H.J. 518. |
2018-03-07 | House | Amendment H-8201 filed. H.J. 517. |
2018-03-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-02-27 | House | Subcommittee: Baltimore, Bossman and Wolfe. H.J. 426. |
2018-02-23 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 374. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB601 (Related) 2018-02-15 - See HF 2465
SSB3163 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2018 3:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge (Cancelled)
SSB3163 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2018 3:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge (Cancelled)
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF2465 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF2465.html |