IA HF2446 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Kinney, and J. Taylor. S.J. 423.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Kinney, and J. Taylor. S.J. 423.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to sexual exploitation of a minor, and making penalties applicable.(Formerly HF 2232.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to sexual exploitation of a minor, and making penalties applicable.(Formerly HF 2232.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Kinney, and J. Taylor. S.J. 423. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 398. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 398. |
2022-02-24 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 419. |
2022-02-24 | House | Passed House, yeas 96, 0 nays. H.J. 412. |
2022-02-17 | House | Fiscal note. |
2022-02-16 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 281. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2232 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 419.