IA HF244 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Withdrawn. H.J. 645.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Withdrawn. H.J. 645.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to language and literacy development for deaf and hard-of-hearing children.(See HF 604.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to language and literacy development for deaf and hard-of-hearing children.(See HF 604.)
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Jacobsen [R] | Rep. Art Staed [D] | Sen. Sandy Salmon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 645. |
2021-02-18 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 604. |
2021-02-17 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 469. |
2021-02-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-02-11 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/16/2021 12:30PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2021-02-10 | House | Subcommittee: Salmon, Donahue and Kerr. H.J. 370. |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 210. |
Same As/Similar To
HF604 (Similar To) 2022-05-24 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 939.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF244 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF244.html |