IA HF2438 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to public assistance program integrity.(Formerly HSB 698.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to public assistance program integrity.(Formerly HSB 698.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1 |
2022-03-07 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/09/2022 12:00PM House Lounge. |
2022-02-28 | House | Subcommittee: Meyer, A., Forbes and Fry. H.J. 435. |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Appropriations. H.J. 422. |
2022-02-23 | House | Fiscal note. |
2022-02-23 | House | Amendment H-8084 filed. H.J. 397. |
2022-02-22 | House | Amendments H-8065, H-8066 and H-8067 filed. H.J. 348. |
2022-02-16 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 279. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB698 (Related) 2022-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2438.