IA HF2390 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 753.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 753.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to terminology changes in education-related Iowa Code references to foreign languages. (Formerly HSB 561.) Effective 7-1-18.
Title
A bill for an act relating to terminology changes in education-related Iowa Code references to foreign languages. (Formerly HSB 561.) Effective 7-1-18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 753. |
2018-04-03 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 733. |
2018-04-03 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 733. |
2018-03-26 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 675. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 765. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 47, nays 0. S.J. 760. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 752. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 678. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Subcommittee: Lofgren, Dvorsky, and C. Johnson. S.J. 668. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Education. S.J. 648. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 648. |
2018-03-12 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 566. |
2018-03-12 | House | Passed House, ayes 98 nays none. H.J. 555. |
2018-02-16 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 290. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3028 (Related) 2018-01-17 - Subcommittee: C. Johnson, Behn, and Danielson.
HSB561 (Related) 2018-02-12 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB561 (Related) 2018-02-12 - Subcommittee recommends passage.