IA HF2378 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - Withdrawn. H.J. 588.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - Withdrawn. H.J. 588.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to joint exercise of government powers for federally recognized Indian tribes. (Formerly HSB 644.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to joint exercise of government powers for federally recognized Indian tribes. (Formerly HSB 644.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 588. |
2018-03-14 | House | SF 2289 substituted. H.J. 581. |
2018-03-14 | House | Amendment H-8260 adopted. H.J. 581. |
2018-03-13 | House | Amendment H-8260 filed. H.J. 578. |
2018-02-15 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 279. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3157 (Related) 2018-02-12 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB644 (Related) 2018-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2289 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 822.
HSB644 (Related) 2018-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2289 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 822.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF2378 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF2378.html |