IA SF2289 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 822.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 822.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the joint exercise of government powers by federally recognized Indian tribes. (Formerly SSB 3157.) Effective 7-1-18.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the joint exercise of government powers by federally recognized Indian tribes. (Formerly SSB 3157.) Effective 7-1-18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 822. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 793. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 680. |
2018-03-14 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 587. |
2018-03-14 | House | Passed House, ayes 98, nays none. H.J. 582. |
2018-03-14 | House | Substituted for HF 2378. H.J. 581. |
2018-02-22 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 356. |
2018-02-21 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 330. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 391. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays 0. S.J. 389. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 322. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 317. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3157 (Related) 2018-02-12 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB644 (Related) 2018-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF2378 (Similar To) 2018-03-14 - Withdrawn. H.J. 588.
HSB644 (Related) 2018-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF2378 (Similar To) 2018-03-14 - Withdrawn. H.J. 588.