IA HF2376 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-10 - Subcommittee, McCoy, Anderson, and Schoenjahn. S.J. 512.
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-10 - Subcommittee, McCoy, Anderson, and Schoenjahn. S.J. 512.
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act requiring the development and use of a standard process and form for prior authorization of prescription drug benefits. (Formerly HSB 653)
Title
A bill for an act requiring the development and use of a standard process and form for prior authorization of prescription drug benefits. (Formerly HSB 653)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | Senate | Subcommittee, McCoy, Anderson, and Schoenjahn. S.J. 512. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Commerce. S.J. 490. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 490. |
2014-03-05 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 436. |
2014-03-10 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 467. |
2014-03-05 | House | Passed House, ayes 99, nays none. H.J. 425. |
2014-02-24 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 305. |