IA HF2361 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 544.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act concerning the implantation or insertion of microchips or other devices in employees by employers. (Formerly HSB 580.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act concerning the implantation or insertion of microchips or other devices in employees by employers. (Formerly HSB 580.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 544.
2020-03-03SenateSubcommittee recommends passage.
2020-02-27SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 03/03/2020 12:30PM RM G17.
2020-02-26SenateSubcommittee: Schultz, Sinclair, and R. Taylor. S.J. 451.
2020-02-25SenateRead first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 424.
2020-02-25SenateMessage from House. S.J. 424.
2020-03-03HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 443.
2020-02-25HouseImmediate message. H.J. 367.
2020-02-25HousePassed House, yeas 98, nays none. H.J. 363.
2020-02-12HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 258.

Same As/Similar To

HSB580 (Related) 2020-02-10 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 235.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback