IA HF2351 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - Passed subcommittee.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - Passed subcommittee.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the fees for special registration plates associated with military service. (Formerly HSB 614)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the fees for special registration plates associated with military service. (Formerly HSB 614)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2014-03-18 | House | Subcommittee, Windschitl, Landon, and Riding. H.J. 533. |
2014-03-12 | House | Pursuant to Rule 31.7, referred to ways and means. H.J. 489. |
2014-03-12 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 489. |
2014-03-06 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2014-02-26 | House | Subcommittee, Heartsill, R. Olson, and Rogers. H.J. 352. |
2014-02-21 | House | Introduced, referred to Transportation. H.J. 299. |