IA HF2348 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-12 - Tabled until future meeting. Vote Total: 2-1.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-12 - Tabled until future meeting. Vote Total: 2-1.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act regulating litigation financing contracts, and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act regulating litigation financing contracts, and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | House | Tabled until future meeting. Vote Total: 2-1. |
2024-02-09 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2024 1:30PM RM 19. |
2024-02-08 | House | Subcommittee: Thomson, C., Gustoff and Scheetz. H.J. 233. |
2024-02-07 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 210. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3150 (Related) 2024-02-05 - Subcommittee: Rowley, Boulton, and Reichman.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF2348 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF2348.html |