IA HF2345 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2514.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2514.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act abolishing county compensation boards.(See HF 2514.)
Title
A bill for an act abolishing county compensation boards.(See HF 2514.)
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Dunwell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2514. |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 248. |
2024-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-02-06 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2024 8:00AM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2024-02-06 | House | Subcommittee: Dunwell, Bloomingdale and Wilson. H.J. 205. |
2024-02-06 | House | Introduced, referred to Local Government. H.J. 201. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2514 (Similar To) 2024-03-05 - Amendment H-8141 filed. H.J. 510.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF2345 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF2345.html |