IA HF2345 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 445.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 445.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the financial exploitation of designated eligible adults, and making an appropriation. (Formerly HSB 574; See HF 2614.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the financial exploitation of designated eligible adults, and making an appropriation. (Formerly HSB 574; See HF 2614.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 445. |
2020-02-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-24 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/25/2020 1:30PM House Lounge. |
2020-02-12 | House | Subcommittee: Landon, Deyoe and Hall. H.J. 261. |
2020-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 255. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3076 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2397.
HSB574 (Related) 2020-02-10 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 234.
SF2397 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 484.
HF2614 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - NOBA: House Full Approps
HSB574 (Related) 2020-02-10 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 234.
SF2397 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 484.
HF2614 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - NOBA: House Full Approps
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2345 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2345.html |