IA HF2323 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-30 - Withdrawn. H.J. 750.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-30 - Withdrawn. H.J. 750.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act creating an opioid antagonist medication fund for first responders.(Formerly HSB 634; See HF 2573.)
Title
A bill for an act creating an opioid antagonist medication fund for first responders.(Formerly HSB 634; See HF 2573.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 750. |
2022-03-24 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2573. |
2022-03-24 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 691. |
2022-03-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-03-07 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/08/2022 8:30AM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2022-02-17 | House | Subcommittee: Fry, Brown-Powers and Worthan. H.J. 291. |
2022-02-10 | House | Introduced, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 218. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB634 (Related) 2022-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2323.
HF2573 (Similar To) 2022-06-13 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 945.
HF2573 (Similar To) 2022-06-13 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 945.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF2323 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF2323.html |