IA HSB634 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2323
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2573
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2573
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2323.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2323.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act creating an opioid antagonist medication fund for first responders.(See HF 2323, HF 2573.)
Title
A bill for an act creating an opioid antagonist medication fund for first responders.(See HF 2323, HF 2573.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2323. |
2022-02-08 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 213. |
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2022 5:00PM RM 304.1. |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee: Gobble, Fry and Steckman. H.J. 161. |
2022-02-01 | House | Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 157. |
2022-02-01 | House | By COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY |
Same As/Similar To
HF2323 (Replaced by) 2022-03-30 - Withdrawn. H.J. 750.
HF2573 (Replaced by) 2022-06-13 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 945.
HF2573 (Replaced by) 2022-06-13 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 945.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB634 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB634.html |