IA HF2320 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 799.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 799.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to certain corporations doing business in this state, including restrictions and requirements imposed on nonprofit corporations acquiring agricultural land used in farming, and the duties and liabilities of directors of for-profit and nonprofit corporations. (Formerly HSB 609.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to certain corporations doing business in this state, including restrictions and requirements imposed on nonprofit corporations acquiring agricultural land used in farming, and the duties and liabilities of directors of for-profit and nonprofit corporations. (Formerly HSB 609.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 799. |
2018-04-17 | House | SF 2314 substituted. H.J. 795. |
2018-04-17 | House | Amendment H-8069 withdrawn. H.J. 795. |
2018-03-15 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 592. |
2018-02-21 | House | Amendment H-8069 filed. H.J. 353. |
2018-02-12 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 252. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3105 (Related) 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB609 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2314 (Similar To) 2018-05-04 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1059.
HSB609 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2314 (Similar To) 2018-05-04 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1059.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF2320 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF2320.html |