IA HF2296 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Withdrawn. H.J. 459.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Withdrawn. H.J. 459.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing a physical therapy licensure compact. (See HF 2425.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing a physical therapy licensure compact. (See HF 2425.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 459. |
2018-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-02-08 | House | Subcommittee: Koester, Highfill and R. Smith. H.J. 240. |
2018-02-08 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 236. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2425 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 753.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF2296 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF2296.html |