IA HF2289 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for the designation of a caregiver relating to a patient’s inpatient stay at a hospital. (See HF 2434.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for the designation of a caregiver relating to a patient’s inpatient stay at a hospital. (See HF 2434.)
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Taylor [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2018-02-08 | House | Subcommittee: Dolecheck, Abdul-Samad and Moore, T.. H.J. 240. |
2018-02-08 | House | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 235. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3123 (Related) 2018-02-01 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/07/2018 8:30AM RM 315
HF2434 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Referred to Human Resources. H.J. 594.
HF2434 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Referred to Human Resources. H.J. 594.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF2289 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF2289.html |