IA SSB3123 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2289
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2434
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2434
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-01 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/07/2018 8:30AM RM 315
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-01 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/07/2018 8:30AM RM 315
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for the designation of a caregiver relating to a patient’s inpatient stay at a hospital.
Title
A bill for an act providing for the designation of a caregiver relating to a patient’s inpatient stay at a hospital.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/07/2018 8:30AM RM 315 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee: Shipley, C. Johnson, and Jochum. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
HF2289 (Replaced by) 2018-02-15 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF2434 (Replaced by) 2018-03-15 - Referred to Human Resources. H.J. 594.
HF2434 (Replaced by) 2018-03-15 - Referred to Human Resources. H.J. 594.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB3123 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB3123.html |