IA HF2434 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred to Human Resources. H.J. 594.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Referred to Human Resources. H.J. 594.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act to ensure appropriate discharge planning and post-hospital services for a patient discharged to the patient’s residence. (Formerly HF 2289.)
Title
A bill for an act to ensure appropriate discharge planning and post-hospital services for a patient discharged to the patient’s residence. (Formerly HF 2289.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Referred to Human Resources. H.J. 594. |
2018-03-08 | House | Amendment H-8238 filed. H.J. 550. |
2018-03-07 | House | Amendment H-8207 filed. H.J. 517. |
2018-02-21 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 332. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3123 (Related) 2018-02-01 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/07/2018 8:30AM RM 315
HF2289 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF2289 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF2434 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF2434.html |