IA HF2283 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 607.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 607.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to carrying a firearm while operating or riding on a snowmobile or an all-terrain vehicle. Effective 7-1-16.
Title
A bill for an act relating to carrying a firearm while operating or riding on a snowmobile or an all-terrain vehicle. Effective 7-1-16.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-23 - House - Passed House (Y: 77 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - Passed House (Y: 78 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - Passed House (Y: 78 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor. H.J. 607. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Sent to Governor. H.J. 591. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 591. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 596. |
2016-03-23 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 546. |
2016-03-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 551. |
2016-03-23 | House | Passed House, ayes 77, nays 18. H.J. 539. |
2016-03-23 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8134. H.J. 539. |
2016-03-22 | House | Senate amendment H-8134 filed. H.J. 524. |
2016-03-22 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 511. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 575. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 43, nays 4. S.J. 573. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Amendment S-5087 adopted. S.J. 573. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 558. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Amendment S-5087 filed. S.J. 535. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 535. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Subcommittee, Dearden, Brase, and Rozenboom. S.J. 359. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Natural Resources and Environment. S.J. 329. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 329. |
2016-02-23 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 300. |
2016-02-23 | House | Passed House, ayes 78, nays 20. H.J. 296. |
2016-02-15 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 223. |