IA HF2276 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the presence of a sex offender upon the real property of a public or nonpublic elementary or secondary school. (Formerly HF 2059.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the presence of a sex offender upon the real property of a public or nonpublic elementary or secondary school. (Formerly HF 2059.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Subcommittee: Edler, Kinney, and Sinclair. S.J. 668. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 648. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 648. |
2018-03-12 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 566. |
2018-03-12 | House | Passed House, ayes 97 nays 1. H.J. 560. |
2018-03-12 | House | Amendment H-8009 adopted. H.J. 559. |
2018-02-14 | House | Amendment H-8009 filed. H.J. 276. |
2018-02-07 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 226. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2059 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Withdrawn. H.J. 566.