IA HF2271 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Pending: Senate Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Pending: Senate Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to disclosure of the electronic protected health information of a minor to a legal guardian.(Formerly HF 2064.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to disclosure of the electronic protected health information of a minor to a legal guardian.(Formerly HF 2064.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: []. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Alons, and Wahls. S.J. 418. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Technology. S.J. 375. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 375. |
2024-02-22 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 380. |
2024-03-04 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 496. |
2024-02-22 | House | Passed House, yeas 94, nays 1. H.J. 371. |
2024-02-01 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 180. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2064 (Similar To) 2024-02-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 380.