IA HF2237 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 595.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 595.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to matters involving insurance and the insurance division of the department of commerce to reflect current practices and resolve inconsistencies. (Formerly HSB 583.) Effective 7-1-18.
Title
A bill for an act relating to matters involving insurance and the insurance division of the department of commerce to reflect current practices and resolve inconsistencies. (Formerly HSB 583.) Effective 7-1-18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 595. |
2018-03-14 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 588. |
2018-03-02 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 444. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 507. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 506. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2249. S.J. 505. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read first time and attached to companion SF 2249. S.J. 410. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 410. |
2018-02-21 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 351. |
2018-02-22 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 372. |
2018-02-21 | House | Passed House, ayes 98, nays none. H.J. 346. |
2018-02-02 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 203. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB583 (Related) 2018-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SSB3131 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2249 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Withdrawn. S.J. 506.
SSB3131 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2249 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Withdrawn. S.J. 506.