IA HSB583 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2237
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2249
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2249
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to matters involving insurance and the insurance division of the department of commerce to reflect current practices and resolve inconsistencies.
Title
A bill for an act relating to matters involving insurance and the insurance division of the department of commerce to reflect current practices and resolve inconsistencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2018 12:15PM House Lounge |
2018-01-29 | House | Subcommittee: Pettengill, Landon and Forbes. H.J. 171. |
2018-01-29 | House | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
HF2237 (Replaced by) 2018-03-15 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 595.
SF2249 (Replaced by) 2018-03-01 - Withdrawn. S.J. 506.
SSB3131 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2249 (Replaced by) 2018-03-01 - Withdrawn. S.J. 506.
SSB3131 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HSB583 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/HSB583.html |